U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Venning
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order of Dismissal - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Dismiss ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.