U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. The Boy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.