U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Racine et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 23, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 23, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 20, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.