U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00052
  • Case Name: FSW v. RM1239 Transportation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 28, 2022: [Counterclaim]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 08, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 13, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • June 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.