U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gess
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Modification of Supervised Release Conditions Hearing - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Transfer In/Probationer]
  • June 15, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.