U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Acuity v. Harder than Nails Construction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 24, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • September 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 18, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 07, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.