U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Big Bow v. Ofc Brevik et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.