U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Hall et al v. Restore Montana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Remand]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 07, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.