U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Kumar v. Schildt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • August 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 12, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 08, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 08, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.