U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Johnson v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Errata - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Administrative Record]
  • November 14, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 17, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Case Management Order - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 15, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 09, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 09, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.