U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Save the Bull Trout et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • August 03, 2022: [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.