U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Beaverhead County Detention Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.