U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Mittelstaed et al v. State of Montana Child and Family Services Division et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Pro Se Amended Complaint - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 06, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Affidavit in Support]
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 06, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Pro Se Registration Form]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Consent to Electronic Service]
  • June 13, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.