U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:04-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Savage
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.