U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Lenoir v. Montana State et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 05, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 05, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.