U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Orellana-Banegas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 13, 2022: [Add Counts (Superceding) - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor - SDM]
  • September 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 01, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 29, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.