U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bernach
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 27, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.