U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GLUMBIK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 17, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.