U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dickinson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue ]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.