U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toulouse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 10, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 17, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 17, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.