U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Petition for Remission]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Petition for Remission]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.