U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Butts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • November 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Vacate]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Dismiss ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.