U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rieger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 26, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Docket Call]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.