U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 09, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 09, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • August 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.