U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felicia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 12, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.