U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:04-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Leggins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • July 20, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.