U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00024-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Spani, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Supplement - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Supplement - MT]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: [Compassionate Release]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 18, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 17, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 07, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 17, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Vacate]
  • September 16, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.