U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knoll et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.