U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ANDRE JEAN REUM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.