U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Norzagaray-Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Remark - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • August 03, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.