U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hendrickson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.