U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McIntosh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.