U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hennick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 08, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.