U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Siemens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 07, 2025: [USCA Memorandum - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.