U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Takesenemy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Continue ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 30, 2024: [Continue ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Detention Hearing - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.