U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CROW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.