U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-bk-10084-
  • Case Name: IDLAND CATTLE COMPANY, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Approval - BK]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply to Motion]
  • October 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • October 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • October 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • October 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
August, 2022
  • August 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • August 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • July 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Corp./Part.)]
  • July 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.