U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:12-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paul
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.