U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hazard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.