U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trimble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 09, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 19, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.