U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arrest ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.