U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frantz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 27, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.