U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Klamert et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 26, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.