U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 04, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Detention - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.