U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Remark - MT]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 02, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2022: [Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.