U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jakub
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 17, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.