U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bear Cub
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • July 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.