U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guiot
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.