U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-bk-20073-
  • Case Name: APRIL MARIE ACKERMAN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2022
  • August 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Correspondence]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.