U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Remark - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Reduce Sentence]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.